BETKNOWMORE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK charity helping people take back control of their life from gambling. Betknowmore UK was established by individuals with lived experience of gambling harms, who now use that insight and knowledge to help others. We provide a range of information on and support to those experiencing Gambling Related Harms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income:
£644,303
Donations and legacies | £335.48k | |
Charitable activities | £308.83k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£583,523
Raising funds | £34.52k | |
Charitable activities | £549.00k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £34.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £549.00k | |
Retained for future use | £60.78k |
People

9 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew William Gray | Chair | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Neil Tyson | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joe Lip Poh Seet | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £644.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £583.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £335.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £308.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £549.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £34.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.36k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £202.30k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £146.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF AN ADDICTION TO OR A MISUSE OF GAMBLING PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND MENTORING SERVICES; (B) THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES AFFECTED BY HEALTH, SOCIAL AND OTHER PROBLEMS ARISING FROM OR RELATED TO GAMBLING ADDICTION OR MISUSE OF GAMBLING; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS REGARDING THE NATURE AND ISSUES SURROUNDING GAMBLING, GAMBLING-RELATED HARM AND MISUSE OF GAMBLING; AND (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES COMPATIBLE WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Voluntary Action Islington
200A Pentonville Road
LONDON
N1 9JP
- Phone:
- 08000664827
- Email:
- info@Betknowmoreuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window