INSPIRING MINDS


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 24 February 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Maths and English tuition at GCSE or Functional Skills and well being/counselling sessions for young people aged 14-25 years. Our referrals are students who are not accessing formal education at present and suffering from mental health problems and/or SEND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joann Brett | Chair | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Finnigan | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Thompson | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.05k | £54.55k | £23.50k | £11.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.85k | £53.15k | £19.59k | £9.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2022
(These accounts |
10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 14-25 AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS AND SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS IN SOUTH TYNESIDE THROUGH - THE PROVISION OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH WORKSHOPS; - THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 14-25 AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS AND SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS IN SOUTH TYNESIDE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE OR LOW-COST SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Cookson House
River Drive
SOUTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE33 1TL
- Phone:
- 07724905734
- Email:
- inspiringmindsne@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window