THE AMC FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation makes financial grants to individuals and organisations within the UK and certain other jurisdictions with the objective of preventing or relieving poverty or financial hardship among employees and former employees, and the dependants and local communities of employees and former employees, of Amalgamated Metal Corporation PLC and its associated companies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Hong Kong
- New Zealand
- Singapore
- Thailand
Governance
- 05 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sher | Chair | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iveta Keelan | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fellowes | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison England | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Dempsey | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.86k | £115.56k | £16.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £12.50k | £11.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES, AND THE DEPENDANTS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES OF EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES, OF AMALGAMATED METAL CORPORATION PLC AND ITS ASSOCIATED COMPANIES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Level 35
110 Bishopsgate
London
- Phone:
- 02074665521
- Email:
- AMCFHF@amcgroup.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window