SOLIHULL MIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide services for people with mental health problems, aged 17-65, living in Solihull borough. Services include: open access support/ information, counselling, advocacy, help with work/training, computer courses, organic horticulture, healthy living/sports, art/craft/music, women only services (inc. domestic violence), gay/bisexual mens group, mental health awareness training, housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £170,209 from 4 government contract(s) and £62,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Solihull
Governance
- MIND SOLIHULL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £429.60k | £479.25k | £427.94k | £455.82k | £436.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £412.80k | £400.46k | £400.46k | £437.81k | £379.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £223.99k | £370.64k | £315.38k | £180.09k | £170.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.08k | £0 | N/A | N/A | £62.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 21 February 2020 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 February 2019 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 22 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 1 DECEMBER 1987 AND 26 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND SAFE-GAURDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SOLIHULL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window