THE DOROTHY LAWSON MEMORIAL BURSARY

Charity number: 516072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2020 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 January 2017 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required