Trustees UBUNTU WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1189781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martyn Jon Randall Chair 22 April 2020
None on record
Barbara Garcia Wright Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Clinton Dean Wright Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Silke Bucker Trustee 28 November 2020
None on record
Wade Brandon Whitehead Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
Laura Randall Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
Jemma Louise Hearn Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Steven James Mulcock Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
James Michael Putland Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record
Brendyn John Fahy Trustee 22 April 2020
None on record