CHURCHES TOGETHER IN HULME MOSS SIDE AND WHALLEY RANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote co-operation between churches in Hulme, Moss Side, and Whalley Range by holding regular meetings and services of worship. We make small grants to local churches for the promotion of Christianity, and to local charities - peace week and similar activities are the focus for this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 01 March 1985: Standard registration
- 09 April 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- CHURCHES TOGETHER IN HULME MOSS SIDE AND WHALLEY RANGE (Working name)
- HULME AND MOSS SIDE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225 | £147 | £128 | £215 | £213 | |
|
Total expenditure | £945 | £814 | £540 | £601 | £96 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 30 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 22 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 18 DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE HULME, MOSS SIDE AND WHALLEY RANGE DISTRICTS OF MANCHESTER INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, ELDERLY, DISABLED OR IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
HULME, MOSS SIDE AND WHALLEY RANGE DISTRICTS OF MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window