Trustees NATIONAL BEREAVEMENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1189517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Lissack QC Chair 11 May 2020
None on record
Mary-Anne Franklin Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
James Armstrong Scott Ryall Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Samantha Ruth Phillips Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
LORD KARAN BILIMORIA CBE DL Trustee 06 May 2020
THE COBRA FOUNDATION
Received: 49 days late
BRITISH CARDIAC RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
Baroness Tanni Carys Davina Grey-Thompson Trustee 06 May 2020
NEW MARSKE HARRIERS ATHLETIC CLUB
Received: On time
WEMBLEY NATIONAL STADIUM TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen Orchard Trustee 14 April 2020
None on record
Dr John Gayner Trustee 14 April 2020
None on record