THE ST PETER AND ST PAUL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 516113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.09m £988.35k £856.85k £882.54k £996.81k
Total expenditure £990.36k £984.68k £955.02k £1.03m £968.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £31.99k £28.84k £30.66k £32.38k
Income from government grants £651 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.65k £13.32k £1.12k £910 £1.20k
Income - Other trading activities £33.92k £46.39k £79.96k £65.76k £109.92k
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £928.64k £775.76k £815.87k £885.69k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £651 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £8.65k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £990.36k £984.68k £955.02k £1.03m £968.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.22k £2.20k £28.03k £23.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0