THE ST PETER AND ST PAUL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 516113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Pollard Trustee 18 March 2015 None on record
Rev Patrick Francis Coleman Trustee 11 September 2018
CHESTERFIELD CHURCH OF THE CROOKED SPIRE FUND Received: 22 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHESTERFIELD Received: On time
Helen Bermingham Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Lisa Marie Bolger Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Mary Forbes-Jones Trustee 09 December 2020 None on record
Christopher Lewis Ball Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
Christopher Adrian Burton Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record
Henry Edward Thomas Taylor-Toone Trustee 05 May 2021 None on record
Katherine Ruth Denton Trustee 11 September 2018 None on record