MUSLIM BROTHERS AND SISTERS ASSOCIATION CENTER LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
88990-other social work activities without accommodation not elsewhere classified
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 04 June 2020: Standard registration
- WILLENHALL UNITY CULTURAL AND EDUCATION CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIAL LEGREZIE | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
LADJI BAIKORO | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIEMOKO ISMAEL DOSSO | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAY 2020 as amended on 06 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF COVENTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
148 Roman Avenue
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 2RJ
- Phone:
- 07534360242
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window