Financial history THE FRIENDS OF MALVERN ST JAMES

Charity number: 516114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/08/2017 05/08/2018 05/08/2019 05/08/2020 05/08/2021
Total gross income £14.17k £14.86k £13.87k £11.65k £5.33k
Total expenditure £10.35k £20.67k £15.69k £6.19k £5.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A