CAREER COMPASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
f
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arsalan Khalique | Chair | 14 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Ross McCaskill | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Brown | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £10.00k | £15.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.31k | £22.01k | £24.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SECONDARY SCHOOL STUDENTS IN STATE EDUCATION IN LONDON OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY EDUCATING SAID YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE WORKING PRACTICES AND METHODS OF PROFESSIONAL ORGANISATIONS BY OFFERING MENTORING PROGRAMMES AND SEMINARS FROM INDUSTRY EXPERTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
175A HOE STREET
LONDON
E17 3AP
- Phone:
- +442085208638
- Email:
- katie@career-compass.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window