Governing document SCHOOLS OUTREACH LIMITED
Charity number: 516184
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 JULY 1985, 17 APRIL 1991, 10 JULY 1991 AND 27 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT THE INCIDENCE OF PERSONAL AND SOCIAL PROBLEMS AMONGST SCHOOLCHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR TO APPOINT AND TRAIN PERSONS WHO WILL COUNSEL AND ADVISE SCHOOLCHILDREN IN THEIR PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.