CYLCH MEITHRIN PWLL COCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin Pwll Coch will provide preschool education and care to children aged 3 years old through the medium of Welsh. Our aim will be to provide every child and family the opportunity to learn new experiences through the medium of Welsh offering them a sound foundation on their journey to a bilingual education and life. This will be achieved through various activities that promote children'
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 17 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dewi Geraint Rees | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Avci | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cunnah | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 344 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 344 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 710 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 710 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1075 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1075 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CYLCH MEITHRIN PWLL COCH
Ysgol Gymraeg Pwll Coch
Lawrenny Avenue
CARDIFF
CF11 8BR
- Phone:
- 07494491607
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window