FIRE-RESCUE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Registered Charity proving Fire & Rescue Service to events and other large public gatherings as well as maintaining a response capability to assist statutory services during spate conditions. The charity also provides training to our volunteers in fire, rescue and medical disciplines. The charity is also ready to deploy on a 24/7 basis to flooding incidents and maintains a drone capability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Walton | Chair | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.53k | £9.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 01 October 2022 | 214 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE AND SAVING OF LIVES BY TRAINING AND EQUIPPING FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICES TO HELP EXTINGUISH FIRES AT PUBLIC EVENTS OR WHEN REQUESTED TO ATTEND / ASSIST AN APPROPRIATE AGENCY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 STONE COURT
CRAWLEY
RH10 7RX
- Phone:
- 0300 199 0999
- Email:
- Contact@fire-rescue.co.uk
- Website:
-
fire-rescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window