Accounts and annual returns LICHFIELD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1190314
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 03 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 03 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window