THE TWEED FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to support community and educational projects that inspire disadvantaged young people to achieve their full potential. We do this by offering grants to smaller charities with incomes of less than £1,000,000 that meet our objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 November 2020: Standard registration
- TFCF (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Paul Tweed | Chair | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Tweed | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Eleanor Woods | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Kendall | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Tweed | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £435.27k | £0 | £19.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.23k | £31.56k | £39.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30 IN LIFE BY PROVIDING GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ORGANISATIONS WHICH ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HIGH RIDGE
CUFFLEY
POTTERS BAR
EN6 4JH
- Phone:
- 01707873067
- Email:
- tweedfcf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window