THE ECCLES AND SALFORD ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 516270
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

28 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)