THE ECCLES AND SALFORD ISLAMIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 516270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £97.73k £93.74k £111.80k £120.87k £113.26k
Total expenditure £40.59k £65.80k £73.02k £80.90k £59.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A