IMPACT LEBANON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Impact Lebanon Charity is fundraising to support the education of Lebanese citizens. Education is vital in nurturing critical thinking, providing a sustainable source of income, increasing social mobility, and is a key building block of a more inclusive society. Our objective is to use part of the proceeds to establish an endowment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Lebanon
Governance
- 23 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Hajjar | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Moustapha Hammoud | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Layal Nabhan | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Gresh | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Zouein | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £77.30k | £16.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.65k | £14.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LEBANON BY: A) PROVIDING GRANTS AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; AND B) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS”.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hoxton Mix Ltd
86-90 Paul Street
LONDON
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 07949053040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window