Trustees BERRIEW RECREATION ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 516318
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA CLAIRE JAMES | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
colin Jones | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Leslie Evans | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN LLOYD WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilde | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sayce Hughes | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Neil Tuffin | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Geraint Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.