THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BENTLEY

Charity number: 1191023
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dave Walker Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Catherine Berry Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
ELIZABETH ANN GRAY Trustee 30 April 2014
DONCASTER YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rev David Berry Chair 11 September 2014
DONCASTER SCHOOLS WORKER TRUST Received: On time
Katie Davies Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Anne Siddle Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record
Christine Walker Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Patricia Paine Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Gillian Genders Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Karen Jones Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record