EXTRA MILE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Extra Mile is building and funds a free school in the Ober Funkia village, Sierra Leone, for children whose parents cannot afford education. We provide education, breakfast, water, uniforms, text books and learning materials to pupils. We facilitate access by volunteer teachers from overseas to teach in other schools in the area as well as our own. We provide teacher training to other schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 17 August 2020: CIO registration
- 07 January 2021: Funds received from 1130879 EXTRA MILE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Stephen Talmage | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kerry Tholley | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wusu Kargbo | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Smidman | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moses Probyn Conteh M.A. | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS RICHARD WELLS | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|||||
ROSALIND ANNE BROOKHOUSE | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARRY STUART HEATON | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PETER FIELDING | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Dorothy King | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian David Hoy | Trustee | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.22k | £42.62k | £38.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.78k | £45.22k | £33.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SIERRA LEONE AND ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERS TO ASSIST IN TEACHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 4884
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV21 9GL
- Phone:
- 07740774623
- Email:
- info@extra-mile.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window