NORTH WALES AFRICA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further or benefit the residents of North Wales, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £13,480 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 27 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ernest Ahiaku | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elvis Ahenkorah | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Baleseng Modubu | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Millman | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Salamatu Jidda Fada PhD | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.30k | £100.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.46k | £78.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £13.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NORTH WALES: 1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NORTH WALES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN NORTH WALES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, PEOPLE FROM THE AFRICAN DIASPORA COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE AFRICAN COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY; C. PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT AND ADVICE; AND D. PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES, WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
NORTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
346
High Street
BANGOR
Gwynedd
LL57 1YA
- Phone:
- 07544073097
- Email:
- nwafricasociety@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window