SGS CHANGING THE FUTURE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides and assists in the provision of facilities and other resources to support and enhance the aims of the school. It does this by raising money. Operates in the school catchment/West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 October 2020: Standard registration
- 19 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SGS CHANGING THE FUTURE (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.87k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £49.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF STEYNING GRAMMAR SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OTHER RESOURCES TO SUPPORT AND ENHANCE THE AIMS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window