ST MARY MAGDALENE PCC

Charity number: 1190593
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RONALD ALAN LEGGETT Trustee 28 April 2019
LANCING LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND Overdue by 129 days
Martin Burgess Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Susan Beatrice Ayres Trustee 01 April 2012 None on record
Rev MICHAEL JOHN MAINE Trustee 20 January 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CUCKFIELD Received: On time
THE CUCKFIELD COTTAGE HOMES TRUST Received: On time
Peta Pratt Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Timothy James Hutchings Trustee 01 April 2012 None on record
Dr ANTHONY JOHN BOND Chair 28 January 2018 None on record
Rev Michael Harry Windridge Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Rodney Vince Pratt Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Martin William Wood Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
Janice Lee Warren Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Linda Anne Barker Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Rev MARTIN MILLS Trustee 29 June 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, COWFOLD Received: On time
Claire Margaret George Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record