Accounts and annual returns YNYSYBWL SENIOR CITIZEN'S DAY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 516408
Charity reporting is up to date (275 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required