Financial history YNYSYBWL SENIOR CITIZEN'S DAY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 516408
Charity reporting is up to date (275 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.53k £10.00k £14.95k £11.03k £12.88k
Total expenditure £26.47k £8.77k £16.82k £12.89k £12.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A