YNYSYBWL SENIOR CITIZEN'S DAY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ynysybwl Senior Citizen's Day Centre Management Committee. People use it for refreshments, dinners, meeting place - used by the WRVS, Social services, bus used to carry disabled people to centre. For the community, dinners and refreshments five days a week. For children and young mothers, dance classes. Bingo for the elderly and all community. Birthday parties and general meetings and concerns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,735 from 2 government contract(s) and £6,735 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 22 July 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arfon Williams | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.03k | £12.88k | £6.31k | £29.00k | £19.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.89k | £12.23k | £8.40k | £31.23k | £17.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.13k | £6.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.13k | £6.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 1981 AMENDED 8 MARCH 1984.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE YNYSYBWL WARD OF CYNON VALLEY, TAI'R HEOL, GLAN NANT, AND COED Y CWM.
Area of benefit
YNYSYBWL, TAI'R HEOL, GLAN NANT AND COEY-Y-CWM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WINDSOR PLACE
YNYSYBWL
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 3HR
- Phone:
- 01443791792
- Email:
- arfon.williams2571@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window