ZICHRON BARUCH

Charity number: 1191450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

as detailed in the charity objects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £444,148
Total expenditure: £443,782

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gabriel Soloweitschik Chair 08 September 2020
None on record
YECHIEL RAPOPORT Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
DAVID LEVKOVITZ Trustee 06 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.94k £267.67k £644.03k £444.15k
Total expenditure £66.58k £260.73k £623.20k £443.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.96k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £644.03k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £621.88k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £1.32k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.13k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £98.36k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
56 STANLEY ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4HN
Phone:
01612116149
Website:

No information available