NOOR FOODBANK LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To aid and assist those in food poverty whoever or wherever that may be in mainland UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 June 2023
Total income includes £6,300 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imran Master | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sadiq Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Riyaz Ismail | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/06/2021 | 24/06/2022 | 24/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.70k | £14.43k | £10.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.36k | £7.72k | £13.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.75k | £5.15k | £6.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days | |
Annual return | 24 June 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 June 2022 | 15 February 2024 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 June 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN PRESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
S K M CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
PEGASUS HOUSE
5 WINCKLEY COURT
CHAPEL STREET
PRESTON
PR1 8BU
- Phone:
- 07764432643
- Email:
- hello@noorfoodbank.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window