Trustees DISABILITY ACTION HARINGEY

Charity number: 1191762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emily Reynolds Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Andrew Carpenter Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Jade Ponnudurai Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Yvonne Denny Trustee 28 October 2020
THE BRIDGE RENEWAL TRUST
Received: On time
PATRICIA CHARLESWORTH Trustee 20 October 2020
CHOICE IN HACKNEY
Received: On time
HACKNEY PEOPLE FIRST
Received: On time
Graham Day Mr Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record