Accounts and annual returns SHAVINGTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 516488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 July 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 August 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 April 2021 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required