THE CULTURAL SPRING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cultural Spring provides cultural, community based activities throughout the city of Sunderland and South Tyneside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £123,946 from 3 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 24 September 2020: Standard registration
- THE CULTURAL SPRING LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graeme Thompson | Chair | 18 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Joan Atkinson | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Glenn David Coyne | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Martin | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Denise Wilson | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Mark Anthony Dawson | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Eleanor Caroline Turner | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ian High | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.36k | £73.22k | £300.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.67k | £53.60k | £237.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £123.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE ARTS BY RUNNING PROGRAMMES OF ARTS EVENTS, PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND WORKSHOPS IN SUNDERLAND AND SOUTH TYNESIDE; ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS AND BY ORGANISING VISITS TO CULTURAL VENUES PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2.18
One Trinity Green
Eldon Street
SOUTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE33 1SA
- Phone:
- 07469030256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window