HARTSHOLME COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Charity representing the people of Hartsholme. Lincoln.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 August 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Bradley | Chair | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Worrall | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dovey | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bean CLLR | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.03k | £75.26k | £2.54k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.08k | £32.73k | £31.65k | £25.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HARTSHOLME AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT')THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF PROJECTS COVERING HEALTHY LIVING ISSUES. (III) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY EDUCATING, ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING THE LOCAL POPULATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL PRACTICE AND WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH SIMILAR GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 DODDINGTON AVENUE
LINCOLN
LN6 7EX
- Phone:
- 07767432090
- Email:
- biffbean@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window