ROTARY CLUB OF DARWEN EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity number: 516522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required