NASARA TELFORD GROUP

Charity number: 1191484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. We promote for the benefit of the Telford inhabitant, other places and the local authorities to advance education and provide facilities in the interest of social welfare and leisure to the inhabitants 2. We intend to provides a secure esblishment of a comunity centre and a recreational facilities to maintain and manage by the organisation and the local authority in furtherance of our objects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £24,246
Total expenditure: £14,521

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALIM KARIMDEEN Chair 26 August 2017
None on record
Awulatu Iddrisu Ayang Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
Ceridwyn Louise Waja Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
Mudasir Saeed Sagna Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
Salamatu Muntari Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
Abdul Nasser Seidu Adamu Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
Mohammed Suleiman Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record
CHAMBAS-AMIN HASSANE Trustee 26 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.00k £16.79k £36.03k £24.25k
Total expenditure £4.00k £4.05k £11.78k £14.52k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.34k £1.84k £500
Income from government grants £756 £2.34k £1.84k £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2024 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 February 2024 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2024 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2024 730 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36
REES WAY
LAWLEY VILLAGE
TELFORD
SHRIOPSHIRE
TF4 2GN
Phone:
07740877107
Website:

No information available