Accounts and annual returns DANDELION DISABILITY EVENTS

Charity number: 1191189
Charity reporting is overdue by 135 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 15 February 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 27 May 2023 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 26 November 2022 298 days late Download Open in new window