Accounts and annual returns GHAUSIA CHISTIA ISLAMIC TRUST ACADEMY

Charity number: 516547
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 February 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 February 2020 19 days late Download Open in new window