BIRMINGHAM BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 516568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 29 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 11 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download