Financial history BIRMINGHAM BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 516568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £293.23k £330.66k £291.39k £278.56k £304.76k
Total expenditure £305.52k £321.48k £286.38k £246.22k £279.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.59k £24.27k N/A