Trustees CYLCH MEITHRIN LLANFAIR CAEREINION
Charity number: 1190875

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Williams | Chair | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nia Wyn Pryce | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Enid Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rhianon Hywel Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARGARET ELIZABETH JONES | Trustee | 01 December 1990 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.