SEDGLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR MISSION STATEMENT. To promote educational, recreational and vocational activities for the community at large by activities run directly by the Association and the provision of rooms for hire to other organisations and private individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
Governance
- 16 October 1985: Standard registration
- SDCA (Working name)
- SEDGLEY COMMUNITY ASS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JUKES | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Bruce | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David William Jones | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith William Chrles Perry | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Yorke | Trustee | 01 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
EUNICE ELSIE EAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY MARGARET ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH LAVENDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS SIDNEY EAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R CHESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MURIEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE GULLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVRIL ANN WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.14k | £30.90k | £18.46k | £27.18k | £32.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.53k | £44.82k | £18.78k | £25.05k | £31.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED ON 4 NOVEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SEDGLEY AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
SEDGLEY AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Wombourne Close
DUDLEY
West Midlands
DY3 3SB
- Phone:
- 01902883995
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window