THE HANBURY TOWER AND BELLS TRUST

Charity number: 516642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 21 January 2021 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2018 22 July 2019 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required