THE HANBURY TOWER AND BELLS TRUST

Charity number: 516642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020
Total gross income £650 £620 £1.34k £739 £871
Total expenditure £134 £1.24k £341 £42 £9
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A