CHRISTIAN MUSIC MINISTRIES TRUST (CMMT)

Charity number: 516643
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funding Christian music ministry

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £75,674
Total expenditure: £50,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire
  • Abu Dhabi
  • Cyprus
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • E B R G TRUST (Working name)
  • THE EAST BIRMINGHAM RENEWAL GROUP TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Eric Mantle Trustee 11 February 2021
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN GREEN Trustee 31 July 2013
THE TLA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MIKE SMITH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHNS, WALMLEY
Received: On time
FLAME TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ANTHONY BRIAN ROBERTS Trustee
ROBERT LLOYDS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PETERS AND PAUL’S CHURCH, WATER ORTON
Received: On time
GILLIAN JOHNSON Trustee
ROOTED COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
JONATHAN ANDREW CHAPPELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £76.09k £44.62k £45.61k £42.04k £75.67k
Total expenditure £60.33k £57.16k £50.67k £16.63k £50.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 November 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 November 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Spadesbourne Road
Lickey End
Bromsgrove
B60 1JP
Phone:
01527576440