ROYAL CENTRE FOR DEFENCE MEDICINE PATIENT WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide help and assistance to military patients and their families whilst the patient is rehabilitating from injuries. Assist with the decompression of the patient and provide for their needs both in a clinical and welfare capacity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 September 2020: CIO registration
- 29 July 2021: Funds received from 1131194 ROYAL CENTRE FOR DEFENCE MEDICINE PATIENT WELFARE ...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Mortiboy | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sargeant | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicola Thornhill | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Moorhouse | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £31.57k | £543 | £2.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.31k | £8.16k | £6.14k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2020 as amended on 04 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OF MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THE RELIEF OF NEED OF MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES, BY PROVIDE DIRECT WELFARE SUPPORT TO WOUNDED INJURED AND SICK SERVICE PERSONNEL, RECENTLY DISCHARGED SERVICE LEAVERS AND THEIR FAMILIES' WHILST UNDERGOING TREATMENT AS A PATIENT OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL BIRMINGHAM FOUNDATION TRUST AND SURROUNDING NHS HOSPITALS OUTSIDE OF THAT WHICH IS PROVIDED WITH THE NORMAL WELFARE MECHANISMS OF THE ARMED FORCES. ADDITIONALLY THIS SUPPORT WILL BE EXTENDED TO PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT WITHIN OTHER UK BASED HOSPITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCDM HQ
LEVEL 2
QUEEN ELIZABETH HOSPITAL BIRMINGHAM
MINDELSOHN WAY
BIRMINGHAM
B15 2WB
- Phone:
- 07914431427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window