INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR PEACE BUILDING AND SOCIAL JUSTICE UK

Charity Number: 1194961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We conduct our efforts by advocating for peace, security, and justice and being a voice for the voiceless. We engage in community mobilisation (specifically the diasporan community and the churches in the UK) and engage the UK government and parliamentarians to support the government of our focus country to put in place measures to address the insecurity situations. We organise Social campaigns.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,678
Total expenditure: £193,192

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR PEACE BUILDING AND SOCIAL JUSTICE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLUWAGBEMIGA BADEJO Chair 25 June 2021
NEW COVENANT CHURCH STRONGNATION STEVENAGE
Received: On time
Toluwalope Oluwafayokemi Tade Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Chinwe Kalu-Uma Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Ifechukwu Nnatuanya Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
OLADAPO BADEJO Trustee 25 June 2021
LIFE TO THE MAX
Received: On time
KINGDOM LIGHT CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £206.32k £5.36k £17.68k
Total expenditure £73.68k £171.88k £193.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PSJUK Suite
Unit 2
Ebury Business Centre
161 - 163, Staines Road
Hounslow, Middlesex
TW3 3JZ
Phone:
07737061366