Trustees PAIN UK CIO
Charity number: 1191657

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Sarah Potts | Chair | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roland Watson | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Betterton | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Pollard | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Bingham | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joel Brown | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY PAUL CHUTER | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Jill Nicholson | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.